Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegates R. Lewis, Angel, and Lierman
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration, in consultation with Baltimore City, to examine and analyze dedicated bus lane enforcement mechanisms in use by certain other transit agencies; requiring the analysis to include an examination of best practices and technologies, a review of potential capital and operating costs, and an evaluation of the most effective methods for ensuring compliance with and enforcement of existing law; and requiring the Administration to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2018.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0551
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {670015/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {670015/1 Adopted 48
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM