Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Food Allergy Awareness
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Buckel, Cullison, Ebersole, C. Howard, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a restaurant, beginning March 1, 2016, to request that a customer inform the employee taking the customer's food order of any known food allergies before ordering; providing that the request may be included on a specified sign or a menu or menu board or made by the employee taking the customer's food order; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to make available on its Web site a list of specified food allergen awareness training courses and tests and a list of specified resources; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1197 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/13/2015 3/17/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1214, 21-330.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM