Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Crosby, Charkoudian, and Patterson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from using a scanning device to scan or swipe an individual's identification card or a driver's license to obtain personal information; prohibiting a person from retaining, selling, or transferring any information collected from scanning or swiping an individual's identification card or driver's license; providing that the Act does not prohibit a law enforcement officer from using a scanning device to record, retain, or transmit information if acting within the scope of the officer's official duties; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0034
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0490 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Age
(   13-301, 14-1327 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:04 PM
Click to return on the top page