Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Cyberstalking - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Jalisi, Pena-Melnyk, Atterbeary, Ebersole, Ghrist, Hayes, Haynes, Korman, Lisanti, McComas, Moon, Smith, Tarlau, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from engaging in conduct that includes installing or causing to be installed specified computer software on another person's electronic device or computer without that person's knowledge or consent for specified purposes; prohibiting a person from engaging in a specified prohibited conduct with the intent to place another in reasonable fear of specified actions; providing for the application of the Act; providing penalties for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-801, 3-802.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM