Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/23/2021 10:58:22 PM
Saturday, January 23, 2021
Saturday, January 23, 2021
House
Early Childhood Subcommittee
Change made: January 23, 2021 3:04 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Early Childhood Subcommittee - Voting Session
January 26, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
(Previous Location: House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD)
HB0237
Del Ebersole

State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
HB0405
Del Lopez

Special Education - Judicial Actions - Attorney's Fees and Related Costs

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 23, 2021 6:33 PM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 5, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0192
Del Guyton

Public Schools - Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video
HB0418
Del Guyton

County Boards of Education - Symbols of Hate - Policy
HB0518
Del Dumais

Public Libraries – Electronic Book Licenses – Access
HB0526
St. Mary's County Delegation

St. Mary’s County – Public and Nonpublic Schools – Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors
HB0550
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Education - School Site Council Pilot Program MC 21-21
HB0566
Del Long

County Boards of Education - Virtual Schools - Requirement
HB0608
Del Solomon

Early Childhood Education - Child Care Provider Support Grant Program (The Child Care Provider Support Act)
HB0609
Del Boyce

Public and Nonpublic Schools - Bronchodilator Availability and Use - Policy (Bronchodilator Rescue Inhaler Law)
HB0614
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George’s County – Board of Education and Chief Executive Officer – Alterations PG 503–21
HB0616
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County Board of Education - Nonstudent Member Compensation and Student Member Scholarship PG 501-21
HB0621
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George’s County – Elementary School Students – Daily Physical Activity (Student Health and Fitness Act) PG 504–21
HB0624
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Board of Education and Chief Executive Officer - Revisions PG 502-21
HB0629
Del Novotny

County Boards of Education – Student Member – Voting
HB0630
Del Solomon

Primary and Secondary Education – School District Energy Use – Policy and Study
HB0651
Del Qi

Education – Educational Interpreter – Certification Requirements
HB0655
Del Crosby

Local Government – County Commissioner Elections – District Voting

Other
Montgomery
Change made: January 23, 2021 12:54 PM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
January 29, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.