Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
Sponsored by
Delegates Williams, Acevero, Atterbeary, Bartlett, Boyce, Crutchfield, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Grammer, Healey, Ivey, Kelly, Korman, Lierman, Lopez, Moon, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Pippy, Reznik, Shetty, Stewart, Terrasa, Valentino-Smith, and Washington
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a law enforcement officer from engaging in certain sexual acts, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a certain victim, witness, or suspect under certain circumstances or with a certain person requesting assistance from or responding to the law enforcement officer under certain circumstances; and establishing a certain exception to the prohibition.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/28/2020 1:33 PM