Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/15/2021 9:46:42 AM
Friday, January 15, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 12/29/2020 12:08 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Adams

Business Regulation – Home Improvement Contracts – Deposits
Del D.E. Davis

Business Regulation – Home Improvement Contracts – Payments

Created: 12/22/2020 4:04 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Stein

Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
Del Lehman, et al

Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

Maryland Agricultural Commission – Hemp Industry Member
Del Wells

Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program

Created: 12/22/2020 4:17 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Shetty

Environment – Statewide Green Business Certification Program – Establishment
Del Rogers

Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
Dels Stein and Lierman

Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development
Del Stein

Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Del Clark

Marine Contractor License – Performance of Services – Licensing Requirements and Fees
Del Hartman, et al

Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere

Created: 12/23/2020 9:47 AM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Shetty

Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Del D.M. Davis

Local Government Tort Claims Act – Definition of Local Government
Del Bartlett, et al

Civil Actions - Tortious Injury to or Death of Pet - Compensatory Damages (Buddy's Law)
Dels Rosenberg and Cardin

Courts – Civil Actions – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Del Crosby

Immunities – Associations, Organizations, and Charities – Liability of Agents and Volunteers

Other
Baltimore City
Canceled
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Baltimore County
Created: 1/12/2021 5:22 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting
(Added - 1/13/2021 11:24 AM)
Organizational Meeting
(Removed - 1/13/2021 11:24 AM)

Eastern Shore Live!
Created: 1/11/2021 11:37 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
General discussion on the events and legislation relevant to the Eastern Shore Delegation.

Frederick Live!
Created: 1/9/2021 8:05 AM
Briefing
9:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
The Frederick County Board of Education will provide an update on school attendance.
The Frederick Board of Health will provide an update on local vaccine distribution.

Montgomery
Created: 1/13/2021 2:30 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County