Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Budget and Management)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering provisions of law that authorize specified State officials or units of State government to take specified personnel actions and set the compensation of specified employees in State government; authorizing specified State officials or units of State government to set the compensation of specified State employees in specified positions; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management, in consultation with the officials or units, to determine the positions for which the officials or units may set compensation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {574664/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/26 (Delegate McDermott) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-6)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {574664/1 Report Adopted 35
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Special Order until 2/26 (Delegate McDermott) Adopted 35
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (125-6) 38
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 37
Senate 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1604 )
(   19-107, 19-206 )
(   14-503, 2-105, 31-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM