Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Kitchen and Counseling Center Project
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Moon, and Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $150,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Don Bosco Cristo Rey High School of the Archdiocese of Washington, Inc. and the Board of Directors of the Don Bosco Cristo Rey Work-Study of the Archdiocese of Washington, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Kitchen and Counseling Center facility, located in Montgomery County; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0308
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1549 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2016 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 71). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 71 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM