Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Acevero, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Bridges, Carr, Chang, Charkoudian, Dumais, Fennell, W. Fisher, Gilchrist, Hettleman, Ivey, Jones, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lopez, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Qi, Queen, Reznik, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Sydnor, Terrasa, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Washington, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing collective bargaining rights for community college employees; establishing procedures for the selection of an exclusive bargaining representative; establishing that a maximum number of six bargaining units may be designated at each community college; requiring certain contracts and agreements entered into before October 1, 2019, to remain in effect until the agreement or contract expires; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0667 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-403, 16-412, 16-414.1, 16-701 through 16-709 )
(   3-2A-01, 3-2A-05, 3-2A-07, 3-2A-08 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM