Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health Departments
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Barkley, Bromwell, Brooks, Carey, Clark, Fisher, Flanagan, Folden, Hill, S. Howard, Jacobs, Jameson, Kelly, Kipke, Kramer, Krebs, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, Metzgar, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Turner, Valderrama, Vogt, B. Wilson, Pendergrass, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, McDonough, Miele, Morales, Platt, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a county health department to issue a mobile reciprocity license to a specified mobile food service facility; authorizing a county health department to charge a fee not exceeding $300 for a mobile reciprocity license; providing that a mobile reciprocity license is valid for 1 year; prohibiting a county from requiring that a mobile food service facility be inspected before a county health department issues a mobile reciprocity license if the mobile food service facility has been inspected by the county of origin; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0262
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {956288/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health Departments
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Favorable with Amendments {956288/1 Adopted 46
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health Departments
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 47
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health Departments
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM