Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Green Purchasing Committee – Food and Beverage Procurement – Greenhouse Gas Emissions
Sponsored by
Delegates Gilchrist, Bagnall, B. Barnes, Barron, Cain, Carr, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, Haynes, Ivey, Jalisi, Kelly, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Lopez, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Reznik, Shetty, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Valderrama, Wilkins, Turner, Belcastro, Bhandari, Charles, Hill, Johnson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Green Purchasing Committee in consultation with the Departments of the Environment, Agriculture, General Services, and other stakeholders, to develop, by January 1, 2022, a certain methodology for State agencies to estimate greenhouse gas emissions of food and beverages procured, establish a certain baseline measurement by January 1, 2023, and develop certain strategies and policy recommendations; establishing a goal to reduce certain greenhouse gas emissions by State units by 25% by fiscal year 2030; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0478
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {666287/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-27)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Green Purchasing Committee - Food Procurement - Greenhouse Gas Emissions
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {666287/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Maryland Green Purchasing Committee – Food and Beverage Procurement – Greenhouse Gas Emissions
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (105-27) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/3/2020 4:27 PM