Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Violence Prevention Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Hucker, Barkley, Jameson, A. Kelly, Kramer, Love, McHale, and Vaughn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified health care facility, on or before August 1, 2014, to establish a specified workplace violence prevention committee; requiring a workplace violence prevention committee, on or before October 1, 2014, to establish a specified workplace violence prevention program; requiring a workplace violence prevention program to include specified components; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, on or before July 1, 2014, to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0804
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1101 through 5-1103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM