Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
Sponsored by
Delegate Terrasa
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a builder of new housing units including single-family detached homes and townhomes or a builder's agent to provide each buyer or prospective buyer with the option to include on or in a garage, carport, or driveway an electric vehicle charging station or a dedicated electric line capable of providing at least level 2 charging; requiring a certain builder or builder's agent to give to certain buyers and prospective buyers notice of certain options and information about certain rebate programs; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1316 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 4:42 PM
Click to return on the top page