Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegates Davis, Adams, Arentz, Aumann, Barkley, Branch, Brooks, Carey, Fisher, Frick, Glenn, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jameson, Kramer, Lisanti, Mautz, W. Miller, Valderrama, Vaughn, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified notice procedures required to enforce a lien on specified property stored in a leased space at a self-service storage facility; requiring a specified agreement to contain a specified statement; establishing that the balance of proceeds from a specified sale is presumed abandoned under specified circumstances; altering specified procedures required for the administration of specified proceeds from a specified sale.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0613
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {507675/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendment
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 47
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Finance 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable with Amendments {507675/1 Report Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 57
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendment 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-307.1, 18-503, 18-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM