Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Living Wage Law - Application and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegates Hucker, Barkley, Cullison, A. Kelly, McHale, A. Miller, S. Robinson, and Vaughn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing an exemption from the payment of a specified wage to a full- time employee who works less than 13 consecutive weeks for the duration of a State procurement contract; repealing a provision of law that specified wage contracts do not apply to nonprofit organizations; and requiring employers under State contract to pay liquidated damages to the State under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0756
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM