Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 12/4/2020 10:12:30 PM
Friday, December 4, 2020
Friday, December 4, 2020
House
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
Change made: December 4, 2020 1:15 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
December 11, 2020 11:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
(Previous Location: Virtual Meeting)
Briefing on Transit Reform in Maryland: New Models for Accountability, Stability, and Equity

Other
Crime Classification and Penalties, Task Force to Study
Change made: December 4, 2020 12:55 PM - HEARING ADDED
Crime Classification and Penalties, Task Force to Study - Other
December 18, 2020 11:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
A livestream link to YouTube for the public will be provided prior to the start of the meeting.
The meeting is open to the public for viewing only (no participation).

Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight
Change made: December 4, 2020 3:34 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight - Other
December 10, 2020 1:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
On-going review of Maryland Environmental Service Personnel and Board Practices.