Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mobile Phone Companies - Third-Party Vendor Billing - Restrictions
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Barkley, Cardin, Conaway, Cullison, Frick, Hucker, Lafferty, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, B. Robinson, Sophocleus, and Stocksdale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a commercial mobile radio service provider from including third-party vendor billing charges on a Maryland customer's bill except under specified circumstances; providing that a customer is not liable for third-party vendor billing charges unless the customer has expressly authorized third-party vendor billing and the customer is provided access to specified information; providing that a violation of the Act by a commercial mobile radio service provider is an unfair or deceptive trade practice and subject to a penalty; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1322.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM