Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Orphans and Foster Care Recipients
Sponsored by
Delegates Jalisi, C. Wilson, Angel, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Clippinger, Conaway, Ebersole, Fennell, Hornberger, C. Howard, Kaiser, Korman, Lam, Metzgar, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, B. Robinson, Shoemaker, Smith, Tarlau, Turner, Vogt, A. Washington, M. Washington, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Orphans and Foster Care Recipients; establishing eligibility requirements for participation in the Program; providing for the amount, duration, renewal, and uses of specified awards; requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance to adopt specified regulations; defining certain terms; and providing for the retroactive application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0669
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-3101 through 18-3106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM