Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Delegates Ivey, Anderson, Arora, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Bobo, Braveboy, Carr, Carter, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Feldman, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Griffith, Gutierrez, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lee, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Mitchell, Mizeur, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Stukes, Summers, Swain, V. Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the issuance, to new applicants, of identification cards, moped operators' permits, and drivers' licenses that are not acceptable by federal agencies for specified official purposes; requiring an applicant for an identification card, a moped operator's permit, or a driver's license to provide specified evidence that the applicant has filed specified Maryland income tax returns or has resided in Maryland for a specified period of time and has been claimed as a dependent on Maryland income tax returns; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0715
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {152712/1
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/25 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {152712/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (82-56)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Reassigned to Judiciary 24
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {152712/1 53A
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Special Order until 3/25 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 53A
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Favorable with Amendments {152712/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (82-56) 64
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-122 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM