Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Children With Disabilities - Habilitative Services Information
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Kelly, Barnes, Barve, Bromwell, Burns, Carr, Cullison, Frick, Guzzone, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Kach, Kaiser, Luedtke, McDonough, A. Miller, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, S. Robinson, Stein, Summers, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, A. Washington, Zucker, and Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a local school system to provide to the parents or guardians of a child with a disability verbal and written information about access to habilitative services at specified times.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0701
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {665369/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments {665369/1 Report Adopted 42
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 43
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41A
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-418 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM