Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0805


CH0331

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism MC 26-20
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 331
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding Montgomery County to the list of counties that exempt agricultural buildings used for agritourism from the Maryland Building Performance Standards; and exempting a building used for agritourism in Montgomery County from a certain building permit requirement under certain circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {990513/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 331
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Montgomery County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism MC 26-20
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {990513/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism MC 26-20
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53B
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 331
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:15 PM