Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Summer Career Academy Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Olszewski, Clippinger, and Mitchell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Summer Career Academy Pilot Program and identifying the purpose of the Program; requiring the State Department of Education to develop criteria for the selection of eligible school systems and eligible students for participation in the Program; authorizing the State Superintendent of Schools to select up to four school systems to participate in the Program; requiring a student selected to participate in the Program to be assigned a summer career counselor and to receive a stipend up to $4,500; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0876
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {925466/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments {925466/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 63
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66
House 4/07/2014 4/04/2014 Returned Passed 71
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM