Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Rudolph, Braveboy, Cullison, Davis, Donoghue, Dumais, Eckardt, Glenn, Harper, Haynes, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kipke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Ready, S. Robinson, Schulz, Szeliga, Zucker, Swain, Hammen, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Costa, Elliott, Hubbard, Kach, Krebs, McDonough, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating a Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness; providing for the appointment of the members and cochairs of the Committee; specifying the duties of the Committee; requiring the Committee to hold specified meetings; authorizing the Committee to hold specified hearings and consider specified votes on specified bills or resolutions; requiring specified reports to be submitted to the General Assembly on or before December 1 of each year; and providing for a delayed effective date.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0795
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {646181/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {327276/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-3)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {646181/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable with Amendments {327276/1 Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 57
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-3) 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-10A-15 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM