Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Junior Advancement via Association Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Delegates Grammer, Arentz, Aumann, Bromwell, Ciliberti, Cluster, Ebersole, Flanagan, Folden, Hayes, Hill, Impallaria, Jalisi, Kipke, Krebs, Lam, Long, McDonough, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, Morhaim, Rey, Saab, Smith, Szeliga, Vogt, West, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a student who is a participant in a career exploration and development activity to prepare and sell beverages in conjunction with the career exploration and development activity, notwithstanding any federal law relating to nutrition standards for beverages sold in schools.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-423.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM