Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Maternal Mortality and Morbidity - Implicit Bias Training and Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Wilkins, Bagnall, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Bartlett, Carey, Carr, Chang, Chisholm, Crosby, Feldmark, Fennell, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Harrison, Healey, Henson, Howard, Ivey, M. Jackson, Kaiser, Kelly, Lehman, Luedtke, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pendergrass, Proctor, Rogers, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Walker, Washington, R. Watson, Williams, P. Young, Morgan, Hill, Rosenberg, Kipke, K. Young, Barron, Kerr, Cullison, Johnson, Saab, Charles
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 337
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the purposes of the Cultural and Linguistic Health Care Professional Competency Program; requiring the Program to establish and provide an evidence-based implicit bias training program for health care professionals involved in the perinatal care of patients on or before January 1, 2021; requiring certain health care professionals to complete a certain training on or before January 1, 2022; requiring the Program to offer a certain training to certain health care professionals; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {186380/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 337
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Maternal Mortality and Morbidity - Implicit Bias Training and Study
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {186380/1 Adopted 43A
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43A
Text - Third - Public Health - Maternal Mortality and Morbidity - Implicit Bias Training and Study
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 44
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Referred Finance 45
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 337
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Maternal Mortality and Morbidity - Implicit Bias Training and Study
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:38 PM