Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Residential Ground Leases - Abandoned Property
Sponsored by
Delegate McIntosh (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a ground lease holder from taking specified actions against the current leasehold tenant of specified abandoned property in Baltimore City to recover ground rent due and owing from a former leasehold tenant before the date that the current leasehold tenant acquired title to the property under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0487
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Residential Ground Leases - Abandoned Property
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {810712/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Residential Ground Leases - Abandoned Property
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Baltimore City - Residential Ground Leases - Abandoned Property
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {810712/1 Adopted 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Residential Ground Leases - Abandoned Property
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM