Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Baltimore City Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0405 (SB0461)
Title
Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0441 /CH0594 (SB0460)
Title
Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace Period
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447 (SB0541/CH0596)
Title
Baltimore City - Board of Municipal and Zoning Appeals - Appeals Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0562 /CH0593 (SB1012)
Title
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Members - Appointment and Removal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838 (SB0487/CH0595)
Title
Baltimore City - Residential Ground Leases - Abandoned Property
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023 (SB0545)
Title
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037 /CH0598 (SB0166)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 (HB1037/CH0598)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 (HB0441/CH0594)
Title
Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace Period
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 (HB0405)
Title
Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 /CH0595 (HB0838)
Title
Baltimore City - Residential Ground Leases - Abandoned Property
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0596 (HB0447)
Title
Baltimore City - Board of Municipal and Zoning Appeals - Appeals Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0545 (HB1023)
Title
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 /CH0597 (HB1030)
Title
Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1012 (HB0562/CH0593)
Title
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Members - Appointment and Removal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0405 (SB0461) Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0441 /CH0594 (SB0460) Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace Period By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0447 (SB0541/CH0596) Baltimore City - Board of Municipal and Zoning Appeals - Appeals Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0562 /CH0593 (SB1012) Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Members - Appointment and Removal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593
Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0838 (SB0487/CH0595) Baltimore City - Residential Ground Leases - Abandoned Property By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1023 (SB0545) Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1037 /CH0598 (SB0166) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0166 (HB1037/CH0598) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0460 (HB0441/CH0594) Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace Period By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0461 (HB0405) Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0487 /CH0595 (HB0838) Baltimore City - Residential Ground Leases - Abandoned Property By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0541 /CH0596 (HB0447) Baltimore City - Board of Municipal and Zoning Appeals - Appeals Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0545 (HB1023) Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0846 /CH0597 (HB1030) Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1012 (HB0562/CH0593) Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Members - Appointment and Removal By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM