Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Valderrama, Kelly, Acevero, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Barve, Boyce, Cain, Carr, Chang, Charkoudian, Charles, Conaway, Crutchfield, Cullison, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Hettleman, Holmes, Ivey, M. Jackson, Kaiser, Kerr, Korman, Krimm, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Lopez, Love, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Rogers, Rosenberg, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, Turner, Washington, Wells, Wilkins, Williams, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program to provide temporary benefits to a covered individual who is taking leave from employment; establishing the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund; requiring, beginning January 1, 2021, certain employees, employers, and self-employed individuals to pay certain contributions; authorizing, beginning July 1, 2022, a covered individual taking certain leave from employment to submit a claim for benefits; authorizing the establishment of private employer plans; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0539
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8.3-101 through 8.3-1001, 8-302   )
Last Updated: 2/25/2020 9:33 AM