Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing – Sales Tax Sunset Extension and Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Chang
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the termination of certain provisions of law making sales and charges related to peer-to-peer car sharing subject to a certain sales and use tax rate; and requiring the Department of Legislative Services to report to the General Assembly by December 31, 2020, certain information that could assist the General Assembly in determining a fair and equitable State taxation on sales and charges made in connection with peer-to-peer car sharing.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0573
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {885967/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {643325/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing – Sales Tax Sunset Extension and Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Short-Term Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing - Rate Alteration and Sunset Repeal
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {885967/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 48
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Floor Amendment {643325/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing – Sales Tax Sunset Extension and Study
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 49A
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 51
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:08 PM