Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's and Chain Stores Licenses and Personal Property Tax - Fees and Exemptions
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Brooks, Chang, Clark, Clippinger, Glenn, Haynes, Impallaria, Kramer, Krimm, Lierman, Lisanti, McDonough, McKay, A. Miller, W. Miller, Rose, Waldstreicher, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the provision of law that a specified person have a chain store license under specified circumstances and pay a specified fee for a specified chain store license; altering the amount of the fee for a trader's license; repealing the requirement that the amount of the fee for a trader's license be based on the value of an applicant's stock-in-trade; exempting a visually handicapped applicant who meets specified standards or Blind Industries and Services of Maryland from a specified trader's license fee; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Regulation - Trader's and Chain Stores Licenses and Personal Property Tax - Fees and Exemptions
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-1801, 17-1805, 17-1806, 17-1808, 17-1809, 17-1812 )
(   7-109, 7-222 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM