Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - In-State Tuition - Reduction for Educators
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Bates, Burns, Frank, Guzzone, Howard, Ivey, Luedtke, McComas, McDonough, Minnick, Murphy, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Vaughn, and Wood
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing by $1,000 the annual resident tuition rate at public institutions of higher education for specified educators and their immediate family members, and requiring each public institution of higher education to adopt policies to implement the tuition reduction.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/02/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.9 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM