Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education Fair Share Act
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Anderson, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Bobo, Braveboy, Clagett, Clippinger, Cullison, DeBoy, Feldman, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Glenn, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, Kramer, Lafferty, Luedtke, Malone, McHale, McIntosh, A. Miller, Mizeur, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Reznik, B. Robinson, Stein, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the matters of negotiation that may be included in collective bargaining between an employee organization and specified system institutions, Morgan State University, St. Mary's College of Maryland, or Baltimore City Community College; requiring employees of specified institutions of higher education to furnish written proof of specified payments to the President of the institution or the President's designee; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0841
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {364463/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-40)
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {917473/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (35-12)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-42)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable with Amendments {364463/1 Report Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 48A
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate Conway) Adopted 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (92-40) 53A
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Finance 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments {917473/1 Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (35-12) 60
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (94-42) 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM