Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery Agency - Veterans Lottery - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Boteler, Arentz, Aumann, Barve, Bromwell, Cluster, Frank, Hogan, Jacobs, Kach, McDermott, Minnick, Olszewski, Smigiel, Stukes, Walker, and Weir
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Lottery Agency to conduct a lottery on November 11 of each year for the benefit of the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund; requiring the Agency to deposit into the Fund a percentage of the proceeds, after specified expenses are paid; requiring the State Lottery Agency to meet specified advertising criteria in conducting the veterans lottery; and requiring that specified proceeds deposited in the Fund be used to provide services for veterans who return home from overseas deployment.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0260 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-120, 9-120.1, 9-913 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM