Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Executive Director of the Department of Legislative Services to ensure that the responsibilities of the Department are carried out; altering the offices that comprise the Department; requiring the Executive Director, with the approval of and in consultation with certain individuals, to appoint certain office directors; altering certain duties of the Department to review certain reporting requirements; establishing the Office of Operations and Support Services to directly supervise certain support services; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0892
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203826/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {583826/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {203826/1 Adopted 40
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Floor Amendment {583826/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted 40
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Rules 43
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Text - Chapter - General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1201 through 2-1203, 2-1204, 2-1205, 2-1206, 2-1207, 2-1208, 2-1209, 2-1211, 2-1212, 2-1213, 2-1214, 2-1215, 2-1215.1, 2-1216, 2-1217, 2-1218, 2-1219, 2-1228 through 2-1233, 2-1234, 2-1235, 2-1236, 2-1239 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM