Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legislative Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 /CH0591
Title
State Board of Law Examiners – Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874 /CH0281 (SB0892)
Title
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 /CH0011
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812 /CH0012
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB0874/CH0281)
Title
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0097 /CH0591 State Board of Law Examiners – Sunset Extension By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591
Judiciary
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0874 /CH0281 (SB0892) General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 PM
Rules
3/15/2018 - 11:00 AM
SB0811 /CH0011 Annual Curative Bill By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0812 /CH0012 Annual Corrective Bill By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0892 (HB0874/CH0281) General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 11:00 a.m.
Rules
3/15/2018 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM