Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Burial Sites – Access, Required Consultation, and Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Delegates Knotts, Angel, Hill, Pena-Melnyk, and Pendergrass
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that the owner of a burial site or land encompassing a burial site that is more than 50 years old and in which the majority of persons interred have been interred for over 50 years to consult with the Maryland Historical Trust regarding certain matters; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant a property tax credit on a real property improvement that substantiates, demarcates, commemorates, or celebrates a burial ground; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1242
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {416581/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Burial Sites – Access, Required Consultation, and Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Burial Sites – Access, Required Consultation, and Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Text - First - Burial Sites - Access, Disinterment, Criminal Penalties, and Tax Credit
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {416581/1 Adopted 48
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Burial Sites – Access, Required Consultation, and Tax Credit
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Finance Budget and Taxation 48C
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Hearing canceled (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Text - Chapter - Burial Sites – Access, Required Consultation, and Tax Credit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-121, 14-121.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM