Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Marijuana Control Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Barnes, Barve, Bobo, Cardin, Carr, Carter, Clagett, Cullison, Dwyer, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hixson, Hucker, A. Kelly, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Mizeur, Morhaim, Niemann, Oaks, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Stukes, Summers, F. Turner, Valderrama, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified criminal prohibitions against the use, possession, and sale of marijuana; establishing specified exemptions from prosecution for specified persons for using, obtaining, purchasing, transporting, or possessing marijuana under specified circumstances; providing exemptions from prosecution for specified retailers, marijuana product manufacturers, marijuana cultivation facilities, and safety compliance facilities under specified circumstances; establishing a specified affirmative defense; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0658
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/05/2014 Text - First - Marijuana Control Act of 2014
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1201 through 5-1231, 5-601, 5-620 )
(   12.5-101 through 12.5-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM