Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First Responders
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone, Arentz, Cluster, Folden, Glass, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, McComas, W. Miller, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rey, Saab, Szeliga, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is convicted of first-degree murder may be sentenced to death under specified circumstances; providing that the murder of a law enforcement officer, a correctional officer, or a first responder under specified circumstances constitutes aggravating circumstances that the court or jury must consider in making a determination as to the imposition of the death penalty; establishing procedures for the imposition of the death penalty; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First Responders
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-901 through 3-909, 4-101, 4-305, 6-112, 7-301 )
(   12-307, 3-8A-03, 3-8A-06, 8-404, 8-420, 9-204 )
(   11-404, 3-105, 3-106, 3-107, 4-204, 5-101, 7-101, 7-103, 7-107, 7-201 through 7-204, 8-108 )
(   14-101, 2-201, 2-202, 2-301, 2-303, 2-304, 2-305, 2-401 )
(   16-812 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM