Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Civil Actions - Subpoena for Police Officer - Liability of Party for Reimbursement of Cost
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Delegation (By Request - Baltimore County Administration)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a party who requests the issuance of a subpoena in specified civil actions to compel the attendance of a police officer employed by the Baltimore County Police Department to reimburse the Police Department for the cost of the police officer's salary and travel expenses to attend court; requiring a deposit of $250 to be tendered when the subpoena is served; providing that a police officer is not required to attend court in response to a subpoena unless the required deposit has been paid; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0329
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM