Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - State Employees and Teachers - Benefits
Sponsored by
Delegates Aumann, Ghrist, S. Howard, Kittleman, Krebs, McComas, W. Miller, Morgan, Saab, Vogt, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified local employer contributions for members of the Teachers' Pension System; establishing a State Employees' and Teachers' Integrated Pension System and a State Employees' and Teachers' Integrated Pension System Savings Plan for individuals who are members of the Employees' Pension System or the Teachers' Pension System on or after July 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0602
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - State Employees and Teachers - Benefits
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-101, 23-212, 23-229, 23-230, 23-401, 23-402, 29-402, 33-101 through 33-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM