Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Personal Property Tax - Manufacturing Property - Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegates Olszewski, Barve, and Stukes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "manufacturing" to include handling or movement of a finished product at a manufacturing site before storage or shipping; and making specified personal property used for handling or movement of a finished product at a manufacturing site after the last step of production through the next immediate step before storage or shipping exempt from property tax.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0872
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 7-225 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM