Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Payment of Tuition at a Community College
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Anderson, Angel, Barve, Brooks, Carr, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Ebersole, Fennell, Frush, Gaines, Glass, Glenn, Hayes, Hettleman, Jalisi, Jones, Knotts, McCray, A. Miller, Morhaim, Mosby, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Reznik, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Sydnor, A. Washington, M. Washington, West, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual who pays specified tuition and fees at a community college to claim a credit against the State income tax up to the amount of State income tax imposed or tuition paid for the taxable year; prohibiting an individual from claiming the credit for the amount of tuition otherwise covered by grants or loans; requiring the Comptroller to adopt specified regulations; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0064 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Payment of Tuition at a Community College
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Payment of Tuition at a Community College
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM