Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Slot Machines - Ownership and Operation by War Veterans' Organizations - Allocation of Proceeds
Sponsored by
Delegates Boteler, Minnick, Cluster, DeBoy, Frank, George, Glass, Hogan, Kach, Otto, Sophocleus, Stein, Stukes, and Weir
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making provisions that authorize eligible war veterans' organizations to operate slot machines applicable statewide; altering the definition of "eligible organization" to make it applicable to a war veterans' organization that has been located in the State for at least 5 years before the organization applies for a license for a slot machine; specifying the manner in which the proceeds from the slot machines of war veterans' organizations located in specified counties are to be used; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1348 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM