Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Legalization
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Cassilly, Barve, Holmes, Kramer, Lisanti, Miele, Moon, Morales, and Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law relating to growing or cultivating industrial hemp for agricultural research purposes; repealing a contingency on provisions of law authorizing a person to plant, grow, harvest, possess, process, sell, or buy industrial hemp in the State; repealing a contingency on provisions of law that alter the definition of "marijuana" for purposes of specified provisions of law relating to controlled dangerous substances to exclude industrial hemp; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Legalization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Legalization
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101, 14-102 )
(   5-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM