Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Home Invasion
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone, Aumann, Folden, Gutierrez, S. Howard, Jacobs, Krebs, McComas, W. Miller, Parrott, Saab, and B. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Classifying the offense of home invasion as a crime of violence under a specified provision of law.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Home Invasion
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Home Invasion
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Home Invasion
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Home Invasion
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Home Invasion
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 42
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Home Invasion
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM