Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Child Support Payments
Sponsored by
Delegates Olszewski, Barkley, Bohanan, DeBoy, Elliott, Guzzone, Kach, Kaiser, Krebs, Lafferty, Luedtke, McComas, McMillan, Mitchell, Morhaim, Murphy, Schulz, Simmons, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Wilson, and Cardin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified video lottery operation licensees to provide specified notices to specified obligors who win prizes and who owe child support; requiring specified video lottery operation licensees to make specified payments, withhold specified amounts, and transfer specified amounts under specified circumstances; authorizing specified obligors to appeal specified proposed transfers; requiring the Child Support Enforcement Administration to notify the video lottery operation licensee on the distribution of specified prizes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {195068/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Dumais) {743022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/17 (Turner F) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {469830/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Delegates Luedtke, Myers, and Walker
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senators King, DeGrange, and Madaleno
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {195068/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Special Order until next session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Dumais) {743022/1 Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Special Order until 3/17 (Turner F) Adopted 48A
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/17/2014 3/14/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 50
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {469830/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 58
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 House Requests Senate Recede 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Delegates Luedtke, Myers, and Walker 66
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Refuses to Recede 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senators King, DeGrange, and Madaleno 62
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 69
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-113.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM