Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Barve, Busch, Davis, Frick, Jones, Kaiser, McIntosh, Pendergrass, Vallario, Bromwell, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Attorney General to employ specified assistant counsel; authorizing the Attorney General to take specified actions on civil and criminal suits and actions that are based on the federal government's action or inaction that threatens the public interest and welfare of the residents of the State; requiring the Attorney General to provide the Governor with specified notice; requiring the Governor to provide $1,000,000 in fiscal year 2019 and thereafter; requiring the Attorney General to submit a specified report; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0665
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {796688/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {363020/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (49-86)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {233926/1 (Delegate Aumann) Rejected (50-89)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {953825/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (53-85)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {543722/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (52-81)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (85-49)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {793124/1 (Senator Bates)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {793124/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {403827/2 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {863129/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (18-27)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {663124/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-29)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-15)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Favorable with Amendments {796688/1 Adopted 46
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 46
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Floor Amendment {363020/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (49-86) 47
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Floor Amendment {233926/1 (Delegate Aumann) Rejected (50-89) 47
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Floor Amendment {953825/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (53-85) 47
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Floor Amendment {543722/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (52-81) 47
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Third Reading Passed (85-49) 48
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-30) 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Adopted 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Amendment {793124/1 (Senator Bates) 53
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 53
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Floor Amendment {793124/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Floor Amendment {403827/2 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (15-31) 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Floor Amendment {863129/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (18-27) 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Floor Amendment {663124/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-29) 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (30-15) 54
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Text - Chapter - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-105, 6-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM