Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Acquittal, Dismissal, and Nolle Prosequi
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, Morales, Adams, Barron, Branch, Carozza, Conaway, Dumais, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glass, Hayes, Moon, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Sydnor, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Walker, M. Washington, West, and C. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is entitled to expungement under a specified provision of law based on an acquittal, a dismissal, a nolle prosequi, or a nolle prosequi with the requirement of drug or alcohol treatment many not be required to pay any fee or costs in connection with the expungement.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {182215/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-26)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {182215/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (111-26) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM