Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel - Training Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Pena-Melnyk, Hill, Lam, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to require, beginning on or before July 1, 2017, specified school personnel to complete training in, by a method determined by the State Board after consultation with the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board, specified knowledge and skills required to understand and respond to the social, emotional, and personal development of students; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
(   6-122, 6-704.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page